Governing document THE INSTITUTE OF OPERATIONS MANAGEMENT
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 JULY 1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 4 OCTOBER 1978, 23 JUNE 1983, 27 JUNE 1985, 19 SEPTEMBER 1987, 5 OCTOBER 1994 AND 11 OCTOBER 1995.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE SCIENCE OF OPERATIONS AND MATERIALS MANAGEMENT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE APPLICATION OF PRODUCTION AND INVENTORY CONTROL TECHNIQUES IN MANUFACTURING AND SERVICE INDUSTRIES (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "OPERATIONS MANAGEMENT") FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND THE BETTER EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PRACTITIONERS AND TO CONDUCT, ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN OPERATIONS MANAGEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.