COX GREEN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities for recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life of the inhabitants of Cox Green in the County of Berkshire and its immediate neighbourhood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,539 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 27 February 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Moriarty | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Alexander Charles Reeves | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARK JULIAN RUSSELL | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Margaret Hopper | Trustee | 16 March 2019 |
|
|||||
RUBY JEAN DOUGHTY | Trustee | 06 August 2012 |
|
|||||
ROBERT CHESSHER WINLO | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £199.04k | £170.87k | £165.02k | £191.24k | £183.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.50k | £160.18k | £170.65k | £182.96k | £189.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £4.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.66k | £12.00k | £15.39k | £17.08k | £12.54k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH DECEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF COX GREEN IN THE COUNTY OF BERKSIRE AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIGION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDIDTIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
COX GREEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
COX GREEN COMMUNITY CENTRE
51 HIGHFIELD LANE
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 3AX
- Phone:
- 01628636715
- Email:
- manager@coxgreen.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window