THE MARMADUKE CRADOCK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To hold a picture entitled 'Peacocks and Hens with their chicks in a Park', painted by Marmaduke Cradock, and any further items of interest having connection with Somerton, for the benefit of the inhabitants of Somerton in the County of Somerset.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 02 March 1979: Standard registration
- THE MARMADUKE CRADDOCK TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Davis | Chair | 01 July 2008 |
|
|
||||
Joan Lucy Banbury | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Enid Isobel Thresher | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Rosina Gibbon | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE DEIRDRE GALE | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIMON RICHARD BUCKELL | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Clara Jadwiga CARLYON | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|||||
MARY ELIZABETH WILSON DAVIS | Trustee | 01 August 2008 |
|
|
||||
NANCY GEORGINA SCHOOLING | Trustee |
|
||||||
Janet Rosemary HAYTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROY COPELAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £613 | £73 | £44 | £942 | £3.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.61k | £809 | £859 | £1.70k | £976 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15TH JANUARY 1979, AS AMENDED ON 13TH AUGUST 2003 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74(2)(D)
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS AT LARGE OF SOMERTON IN THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF SOMERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 Behind Berry
SOMERTON
Somerset
TA11 6SF
- Phone:
- 07751 742983
- Email:
- j.banbury@mypostoffice.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window