THE SIMON SIDNEY HILL HALL CHARITY

Charity number: 277262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A church hall for church use and available for use (sporting, social etc.) by various local community organisations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £4,692
Total expenditure: £3,700

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 January 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ANDREW JAMES BELL Chair 01 September 2024
CHURCHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
BRIAN DAVID PRICE Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
JUDITH MARGARET PRICE Trustee 01 September 2022
CHURCHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
JACQUELENE YUK YENG SEEL Trustee 24 November 2020
CHURCHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Robert Kenneth Young Trustee 24 November 2020
CHURCHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
SOMERSET MENDIP CIRCUIT - METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
CHRISTINE SHAW Trustee 24 November 2020
CHURCHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Sharon Dawn Wilkinson Trustee 24 November 2020
CHURCHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Helen Janet Brown Trustee 24 November 2020
CHURCHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Stuart Martin Seel Trustee 16 November 2017
SOMERSET MENDIP CIRCUIT - METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
CHURCHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
RUTH THOMAS Trustee
SOMERSET MENDIP CIRCUIT - METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
THE VICTORIA JUBILEE LANGFORD HOMES
Received: On time
THE SIDNEY HILL CHURCHILL WESLEYAN COTTAGE HOMES
Received: On time
CHARLES GRAHAM STONE'S RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
CHURCHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
MRS JACKIE HAWKESBY Trustee
None on record
TREVOR JONES Trustee
CHURCHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
ANN MARGARET PURSEY Trustee
CHURCHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
JEANNETTE JONES Trustee
CHURCHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
EDWARD GEORGE CHAPLIN Trustee
CHURCHILL METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £2.70k £1.96k £1.18k £1.74k £4.69k
Total expenditure £3.50k £800 £7.40k £1.80k £3.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 03 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 September 2020 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4
The Chestnuts
Winscombe
Winscombe
Somerset
BS25 1LD
Phone:
01934844134
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available