EXETER AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER - ISCATAPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of bi monthly digital recorded media and audio cassettes if requested for blind and sight impaired persons in the Exeter area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 18 April 1979: Standard registration
- ISCATAPE (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Timothy Neil Harlow | Chair | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Stott | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Buchanan-Smith | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Elisabeth Manhire | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Hawkins | Trustee | 04 May 2007 |
|
|
||||
STEVE LEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEN LAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276 | £730 | £620 | £84 | £712 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.82k | £751 | £2.87k | £921 | £1.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES DATED 16TH OCTOBER 1978 AS AMENDED 22ND MAY 1981,25TH APRIL 1986,1ST MAY 1991 AND 13TH MAY 1992, AND 28 APRIL 1998
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE VISUALLY HANDICAPPED AND THOSE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF FREE RECORDED TAPES AND COMPLEMENTARY APPARATUS WHERE NECESSARY, USING THE POSTAL CONCESSION AVAILABLE TO THE HANDICAPPED FOR THOSE PEOPLE ENTITLED TO RECEIVE IT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE EXETER AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
ISCATAPE c/o Wilkinson Grant
1 Castle Street
EXETER
EX4 3PT
- Phone:
- 01392455918
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window