WINDMILL HILL CITY FARM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Windmill Hill City Farm provides a range of educational, recreational and therapeutic services and facilities to the local community including a farm and community gardens, a cafe, a variety of courses, activities and facilities for children and young people (a day-care nursery and playground), older peoples groups, and services for people with mental health issues or learning difficulties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,326,158
Donations and legacies | £398.71k | |
Charitable activities | £1.21m | |
Other trading activities | £710.52k | |
Investments | £5.88k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,546,039
Raising funds | £534.80k | |
Charitable activities | £2.01m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £56,039 from 2 government contract(s) and £123,036 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £534.80k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.01m |
People

129 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 02 February 1979: Standard registration
- WINDMILL HILL CITY FARM (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Instrall | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Wales | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Frost | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Claire Jeffwitz | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Edward Lund | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alice Cutler Clarke | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Jane Dunham | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Sharp | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SALLY JONES | Trustee |
|
||||||
JAMIE DARWEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.92m | £2.00m | £2.17m | £2.44m | £2.33m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.93m | £1.78m | £2.08m | £2.49m | £2.55m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £13.52k | £13.52k | £13.00k | £50.49k | £56.04k | |
|
Income from government grants | £420.61k | £725.19k | £37.42k | £124.97k | £123.04k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £264.82k | £660.35k | £275.88k | £101.13k | £398.71k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £565.88k | £325.20k | £689.62k | £680.43k | £710.52k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.09m | £1.01m | £1.20m | £1.65m | £1.21m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £888 | £270 | £332 | £5.30k | £5.88k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.05k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.52m | £1.46m | £1.66m | £1.94m | £2.01m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £415.28k | £0 | £390.11k | £548.87k | £534.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £7.38k | £297 | £323 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £150.91k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £314.08k | £29.23k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.17m | £1.22m | £1.12m | £1.08m | £1.01m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.79k | £2.79k | |
|
Other assets | £391.48k | £574.12k | £839.03k | £783.96k | £647.83k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £180.00k | £184.25k | £268.89k | £216.82k | £229.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/01/1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/10/1998 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/04/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/04/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EDUCATION OF ALL PEOPLE IN THE NEIGHBOURHOODS IN AND AROUND WINDMILL HILL BRISTOL, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN SUBJECTS RELATED TO FOOD, FARMING AND THE ENVIRONMENT THROUGH PROVISION OF INFORMATION, COURSES, ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES FOR LEARNING; TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND NURSERY CARE FOR YOUNG CHILDREN; AND TRAINING FOR PEOPLE IN ANY TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE, THEREBY ADVANCING THEM IN LIFE AND ENABLING THEM TO EARN THEIR OWN LIVELIHOOD. 2) TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR WORK, THERAPY, EDUCATION AND RECREATION. 3) TO PROVIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE NEIGHBOURHOODS IN AND AROUND WINDMILL HILL BRISTOL FACILITIES INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO A FARM AND GARDENS, AND SERVICES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION, VOLUNTEERING OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WELLBEING. 4) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF PEOPLE DISADVANTAGED IN ANY MANNER IN THE NEIGHBOURHOODS IN AND AROUND WINDMILL HILL BRISTOL IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
WINDMILL HILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINDMILL HILL CITY FARM
PHILIP STREET
BEDMINSTER
BRISTOL
BS3 4EA
- Phone:
- 01179633252
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window