Accounts and annual returns THE REYNTIENS CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 277290
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2013 30 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2012 19 February 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not Required