ROCKBEARE GOLDEN AGE CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MEET MONTHLY AT THE VILLAGE HALL FOR A TALK BY A SPEAKER OR PLAY BINGO OR OTHER GAMES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Elderly/old People
- Devon
Governance
- 07 June 1979: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2005 | 31/10/2006 | 31/10/2007 | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £956 | £870 | £195 | £197 | £262 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08k | £874 | £434 | £217 | £239 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | 28 May 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 15 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | 21 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST NOVEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE PARISH OF ROCKBEARE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ROCKBEARE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window