Governing document CTF TRAINING
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORP. 25 JANUARY 1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 14 AUGUST 1986,16 JULY 1982,6 APRIL 1988,3 MAY 1989, 6 SEPTEMBER 1990 AND 25TH AUGUST 1993
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS BY PROVIDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH YOUNG PERSONS. (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS OF ANY AGE BY PROVIDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING,RETRAINING, AND LIMITED PERIODS OF WORK EXPERIENCE. (III) TO ASSIST UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE OF WHATEVER AGE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING, RETRAINING AND LIMITED PERIODS OF WORK EXPERIENCE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THROUGH ANY GOVERNMENT SPONSORED OR APPROVED PROGRAMMES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.