THE FRIENDS OF RYE ART GALLERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's primary aim is the education of the general public which it achieves by promoting, supporting and assisting in the improvement of Rye Art Gallery through fund-raising, events and supportive admininistration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Surrey
Governance
- 05 April 1979: Standard registration
- 22 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- F R A G (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.18k | £9.54k | £8.91k | £5.02k | £1.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.97k | £7.10k | £9.54k | £10.34k | £9.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 22 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 22 February 2018 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 20 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 11 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED JANUARY 1972 AS AMENDED FEBRUARY 1977 AND 12TH SEPTEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED JUNE 1990
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE RYE ART GALLERY, THROUGH THE ACTIVITY OF A GROUP OF FRIENDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window