Financial history SHILOH UNITED CHURCH OF CHRIST APOSTOLIC WORLDWIDE

Charity Number: 277453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £57.51k £25.65k £48.34k £201.54k £82.96k
Total expenditure £93.29k £22.96k £35.89k £80.16k £53.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A