ELIZABETH HOUSE COOKHAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Elizabeth House is a club for the older residents of Cookham and the surrounding area, located in the centre of Cookham on Station Hill near the railway station. Established in 1981 it has 200 members many of whom use the daytime facilities, including a cooked meal every weekday and a range of activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 10 May 1979: Standard registration
- 05 June 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 05 June 2023: Funds transferred to 1188342 ELIZABETH HOUSE COOKHAM
- AGE CONCERN-COOKHAM AND DISTRICT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.28k | £81.46k | £125.26k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.95k | £85.89k | £91.33k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.00k | £3.00k | £4.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODIFIED MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED FEBRUARY 1979, AMENDED 21 MAY 2001.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE.
Area of benefit
COOKHAM, COOKHAM DEAN, BISHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window