Financial history MISTERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 277476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £13.88k £13.35k £8.39k £17.22k £13.86k
Total expenditure £12.67k £7.58k £6.97k £17.78k £27.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A