Trustees MISTERTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 277476

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Hilson | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Lyus | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
MAXINE DARCY FIELD | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Kennedy | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joan Sweetman | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Terry Worman | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.