NEMCOM THEATRE COMPANY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 May 1979: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- MAYTC (Working name)
- NEMCOM (Working name)
- NEW MALDEN OPERATIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 11TH JULY 1978, AS AMENDED 15TH DECEMBER 1994, AS AMENDED 1ST OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE MUSICAL ARTS AND DRAMATIC THEATRE AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT AND PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE SAID ARTS (AND TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NEW MALDEN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window