THE MARY ROSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To conserve the Mary Rose and her artefacts and display them to a wide audience. To maintain the archives and publish archaeological information and to promote and make accessible, research and knowledge relating to the Mary Rose. To provide world class expertise for maritime archaeology and the conservation of material recovered from underwater. To enable lifelong learning and outreach.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,612,088
Donations and legacies | £696.36k | |
Charitable activities | £2.39m | |
Other trading activities | £458.29k | |
Investments | £12.13k | |
Other | £52.88k |
Total expenditure:
£4,263,313
Raising funds | £386.14k | |
Charitable activities | £3.88m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £386.14k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.88m |
People

67 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
Governance
- 28 March 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL KEITH PURSE | Chair | 02 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Trevor William Keeble | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Audrey Sinclair Grey | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Victoria Suenson-Taylor | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aileen Marion Peirce | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew David Painting | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Terence Richard Stevens | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suzannah Rebecca Gabriella Lipscomb | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Timothy Mark Rusby | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIA MARY WESTON | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Bewley | Trustee | 05 December 2014 |
|
|||||
Adam Humphryes | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN BRANDON | Trustee | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.94m | £2.18m | £3.59m | £2.94m | £3.61m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.39m | £3.25m | £4.11m | £4.23m | £4.26m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.84k | £588.87k | £1.22m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £486.77k | £1.72m | £1.48m | £483.86k | £696.36k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £495.07k | £54.29k | £301.81k | £424.01k | £458.29k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.91m | £377.96k | £1.79m | £1.92m | £2.39m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.68k | £275 | £66 | £2.09k | £12.13k | |
|
Income - Other | £47.88k | £33.78k | £14.38k | £107.04k | £52.88k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £1.77k | £0 | £16.27k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.98m | £3.14m | £3.80m | £3.88m | £3.88m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £405.90k | £114.84k | £305.53k | £355.87k | £386.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £13.64k | £12.06k | £12.49k | £12.49k | £37.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £29.25m | £28.21m | £27.19m | £26.40m | £25.60m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £916.59k | £1.38m | £1.68m | £1.11m | £1.18m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £295.74k | £792.50k | £582.60k | £520.84k | £438.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JANUARY 1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 16 DECEMBER 1986, 23 JUNE 1992, 20 JUNE 2000, 30 JUNE 2006, 20 APRIL 2007 AND 27 JUNE 2008. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 OCT 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
A. TO FIND, RECORD, EXCAVATE, RAISE, BRING ASHORE, PRESERVE, PUBLISH, REPORT ON AND DISPLAY FOR ALL TIME IN PORTSMOUTH THE "MARY ROSE" (OR ANY OF THESE ACTIVITIES). B. TO ESTABLISH, EQUIP AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM OR MUSEUMS IN PORTSMOUTH TO HOUSE THE MARY ROSE AND RELATED OR ASSOCIATED MATERIAL. C. TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP INTEREST, RESEARCH AND KNOWLEDGE RELATING TO: (I) THE MARY ROSE AND ALL MATTERS RELATING TO OR ASSOCIATED WITH HER, AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING HER PLACE IN MARITIME, NAVAL, MILITARY AND SOCIAL HISTORY AND HER EXCAVATION, AND DISPLAY, AND (II) ALL MATTERS RELATING TO UNDERWATER CULTURAL HERITAGE, WHEREVER LOCATED ALL FOR THE EDUCATION AND BENEFIT OF THE NATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mary Rose Trust
1-10 College Road
H M Naval Base
PORTSMOUTH
PO1 3LX
- Phone:
- 023 92 750521
- Email:
- mail@maryrose.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window