Accounts and annual returns RUSSIAN ORTHODOX DIOCESE OF SOUROZH

Charity number: 277508
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 January 2024 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 December 2022 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 August 2022 278 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 August 2022 643 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 August 2022 643 days late Download Open in new window