THE TEMPLE MUSIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is the advancement of musical education for the benefit of the public, and in particular: (1) the promotion of the musical training and general education of the choristers of the Temple Church by the provision and award of scholarships; and (2) the promotion of the appreciation of choral music by public performance in the Temple Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 March 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Hutton | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET BICKFORD-SMITH QC | Trustee | 25 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE BARWISE QC | Trustee | 18 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
TRACY AYLING QC | Trustee | 18 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT-JAN TEMMINK QC | Trustee | 05 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
TOBY PAUL WATKIN | Trustee | 05 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
REV ROBIN GUTHRIE GRIFFITH-JONES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.55k | £51.69k | £40.82k | £15.81k | £43.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.20k | £90.00k | £177.55k | £127.65k | £32.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3RD MARCH 1979
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF MUSICAL EDUCATION IN ANY MANNER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OR ANY SECTION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL RESPECTS AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF DEED)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Landmark Chambers
180 Fleet Street
LONDON
EC4A 2HG
- Phone:
- 02074301221
- Email:
- tobywatkin@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window