Financial history FRIENDS OF ST. HELEN'S SCHOOL, BLUNTISHAM

Charity number: 277524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.39k £6.64k £9.41k £28.40k £18.58k
Total expenditure £11.46k £5.21k £8.05k £12.82k £12.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A