NORTH LONDON CHORUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Per the Constitution, the Chorus aims to promote, develop and maintain the public's appreciation and education in the art and science of music. Focusing on choral music, it performs concerts, and holds workshops for its members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Haringey
Governance
- 03 April 1979: Standard registration
- THE HILL SINGERS (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Bilkus | Chair | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Hastings | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rhona Graham | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim Lutton | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Padel | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Viv Canter | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Stone | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Allan Shaun Davies | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Salisbury | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALAN GRAHAM CHANDLER FCCA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.19k | £23.33k | £31.06k | £47.79k | £50.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.33k | £17.03k | £39.17k | £45.60k | £54.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 22/02/1979 AS AMENDED ON 07/12/2006 AS AMENDED ON 16/01/2014 AS AMENDED ON 03/07/2014 AS AMENDED ON 25 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN APPRECIATION OF AND EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC (AND IN PARTICULAR THE COMMUNITY OF HIGHGATE, FINCHLEY AND MUSWELL HILL) IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC AND IN PARTICULAR OF CHORAL MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND RECITALS TO THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE STANDARD, THE HOLDING OF WORKSHOPS AND BY SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE HIGHGATE AND THE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 MEADOW PLACE
LONDON
SW8 1XZ
- Phone:
- 07984440849
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window