UNITED KINGDOM PRACTICAL SHOOTING ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Association shall be to encourage skill in Practical Shooting by providing instruction and practice in the use of firearms amongst Her Majesty's subjects so that they will be better fitted to serve their country in the Armed Forces, Territorial Army or any other organisation in which their services may be required in the defence of the realm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 December 1982: Standard registration
- UKPSA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clive Gamlin | Chair | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Lawley- | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Guest | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Toner | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Wyborn | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steffan Davies | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Clifton | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Spence | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dave Smith | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Ward | Trustee | 09 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Strowger | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Brooks | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Stephen Cooper | Trustee | 28 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Williams | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.55k | £75.51k | £109.82k | £119.88k | £124.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.15k | £40.31k | £70.26k | £110.21k | £105.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 April 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 April 2024 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH NOVEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 07 JUL 2020 as amended on 24 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE AMATEUR SPORT OF PRACTICAL SHOOTING AND DYNAMIC MARKSMANSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) PROMOTING PUBLIC PARTICIPATION, PRACTICE AND DEVELOPMENT IN THE SPORT; AND B) THE PROVISION OF INSTRUCTION IN THE SPORT, INCLUDING IN THE SAFE USE OF FIREARMS. 2. TO ENCOURAGE SKILL IN PRACTICAL SHOOTING BY PROVIDING INSTRUCTION AND PRACTICE IN THE USE OF FIREARMS AMONGST HER MAJESTY’S SUBJECTS SO THAT THEY WILL BE BETTER FITTED TO SERVE THEIR COUNTRY IN THE ARMED FORCES, ARMED FORCES RESERVE OR ANY OTHER ORGANISATION IN WHICH THEIR SERVICES MAY BE REQUIRED IN THE DEFENCE OF THE REALM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALPHA HOUSE
100 BOROUGH HIGH STREET
LONDON
SE1 1LB
- Phone:
- 0844 500 7520
- Email:
- Contact@ukpsa.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window