MARY AGATE HALL TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The administration of the Village Hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 05 April 1979: Standard registration
- SALFORD VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- MARY AGATE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL HARRIS | Chair | 16 September 2013 |
|
|||||
Tesh Meisuria | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacquie Abbey | Trustee | 05 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine McKendrick | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patrica Laing | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janet Thornley | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Nisbet | Trustee | 22 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Julian O'Dell | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
WILSON SHARP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YVONNE ARNOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS KAY DRAYCOTT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.73k | £13.63k | £11.20k | £20.09k | £6.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.04k | £6.72k | £15.58k | £31.43k | £10.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 31ST MARCH 1977
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HULCOTE AND SALFORD IN THE COUNTY OF BEDFORD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS (INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
HULCOTE AND SALFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUNNYSIDE
28 Wavendon Road
Salford
MILTON KEYNES
MK17 8BA
- Phone:
- 07771883459
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window