SRI GURU SINGH SABHA, KETTERING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious place of worship. Promotion of Sikhism
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 27 March 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nashater Johal | Chair | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
KARAM SINGH BHANDAL | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Singh | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
SOHAN SINGH GARCHA | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
KANWARJIT SINGH BAINS | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.52k | £84.43k | £154.49k | £173.15k | £179.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.49k | £55.87k | £58.66k | £89.12k | £91.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 09 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 09 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH OCTOBER 1977 AMENDED 18TH FEBRUARY 1979 AND 30TH DECEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE KETTERING
Contact information
- Address:
-
SIKH TEMPLE
23-27 KING STREET
KETTERING
NN16 8QP
- Phone:
- 01536410625
- Email:
- sgsskettering@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window