Accounts and annual returns CROSCOMBE VILLAGE HALL FUND

Charity number: 277576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 06 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 20 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 12 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 12 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 19 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 24 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window