THE PASTERNAK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving public access to the artistic works held by the Pasternak Trust (the work of Leonid Osipovich, Boris Leonidovich and other members of the Pasternak family); ensuring the professional cataloguing and conservation of these works; making them available for scholarly study; promotion of the works through exhibitions and a website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 06 June 1979: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR ANN PASTERNAK SLATER | Chair | 15 March 1979 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Andreyev | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Linda Whiteley | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Flora Whiteley | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Slater MPH | Trustee | 04 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr CATHERINE OPPENHEIMER | Trustee | 15 March 1979 |
|
|||||
DR NICOLAS GILBERT PASTERNAK SLATER | Trustee | 15 March 1979 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER GRANVILLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/04/2020 | 10/04/2021 | 10/04/2022 | 10/04/2023 | 10/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.05k | £838 | £8.02k | £7.55k | £17.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.96k | £1.35k | £11.05k | £12.02k | £8.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 April 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 April 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1KTH MARCH 1979
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY PROMOTING THE ARTISTIC AND LITERARY WORKS OF LEONID PASTERNAK AND BORIS PASTERNAK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 LINTON ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 6UG
- Phone:
- 01865558226
- Email:
- info@pasternak-trust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window