Financial history SIMBA FAMILY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity Number: 277609
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £210.13k £170.13k £200.59k £176.19k £134.73k
Total expenditure £344.37k £173.50k £196.14k £202.06k £128.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A