Accounts and annual returns JUBILEE WALKWAY TRUST

Charity Number: 277624
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 15 December 2010 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 25 November 2010 25 days late
Annual return 31 December 2008 27 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 27 October 2009 On Time