Financial history JUBILEE WALKWAY TRUST

Charity Number: 277624
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £60.61k £10.83k £65.93k £14.14k £80.00k
Total expenditure £58.86k £36.91k £47.35k £22.43k £78.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A