THE RABBI MEIR BAAL HANESS - AHAVAS ZION - KOLLEL SIEBENBURGEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of worldwide charitable institutions as determined by the trustees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hackney
- Israel
Governance
- 09 May 1979: Standard registration
- Kaddish & Mishnayos (Working name)
- T.R.M.B.H. K.S.T. (Working name)
- T.R.M.B.H. Kolel Seibenburgen Trust (Working name)
- THE RABBI MAIER BAAL HANESS KOLEL SEIBENBURGEN TRUST (Working name)
- THE RABBI MAIER BAAL HANESS KOLEL SEIBENBURGEN TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isaac Zoldan | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rabbi Akiva Schlesinger | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARCUS LANDAU | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.73k | £91.81k | £107.91k | £136.21k | £103.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.60k | £115.96k | £66.68k | £151.87k | £120.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 February 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 February 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 March 2023 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH FEBRUARY 1979 as amended on 11 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITIES CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 CRAVEN WALK
LONDON
N16 6BS
- Phone:
- 020 8802 9517
- Email:
- rmbhlondon@gmail.com
- Website:
-
trmbh.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window