THE WAREHOUSE CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The short & long term objects of the Charity are for the Skillway arm to provide apprentice style training for young people up to school leaving age in a variety of manual skills,together with pastoral support and for The Cellar Camino Cafe to remain a focal point of serving presence and love with an openess to receiving all those who are lonely or distressed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 August 1979: Standard registration
- SKILLWAY (Working name)
- THE CELLAR CHRISTIAN COFFEE BAR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Courtney Williams | Chair | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Michael Tomes | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
SIMON FRANCIS CROWTHER | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|||||
DR CHRIS JAGGER | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Tak Lop Ko | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Derek Pollard OBE FRSC | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Charles BLAGDEN | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Ian Oakden | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Oakden | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nick Harris | Trustee | 06 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHELAGH MACDONALD GODWIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.94k | £135.83k | £183.83k | £185.98k | £204.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.53k | £128.71k | £159.79k | £212.46k | £212.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £13.90k | N/A | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7TH FEBRUARY 1979
Charitable objects
TO SPREAD THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL PARTICULARLY AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE IN GODALMING AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
GODALMING AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cellar Camino Cafe
THE BURYS
GODALMING
Surrey
GU7 1HR
- Phone:
- 01483417097
- Email:
- info@thecellarcafe.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window