Trustees PRISTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 277636

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guy Davies | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Fiona Hassard | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Farah Josephine Downing | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Franklin Adams | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rideout | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Harvey | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER YOLLAND BROOKES | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE JOSEPH DAVY HAINES | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HELEN COPPERMAN | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JAMES BOTTLE | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CARTER | Trustee | 31 January 2008 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.