ULCOMBE NEW VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a base for social activities for parishioners of Ulcombe and surrounding area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £354 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 26 April 1979: Standard registration
- ULCOMBE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Mary Norman | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|||||
David Norman | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Grimsdale | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor John Sharp | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Odam | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PILBOROUGH | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Anne Cavender Watton | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sara Jackson | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Michaela Boland | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janine Monk | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.94k | £14.52k | £4.66k | £5.64k | £10.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.22k | £7.35k | £6.61k | £10.65k | £11.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.50k | N/A | N/A | £354 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 20TH OCTOBER 1978 as amended on 07 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ULCOMBE IN THE COUNTY OF KENT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ULCOMBE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mansion House Oast
Crumps Lane
Ulcombe
MAIDSTONE
ME17 1EX
- Phone:
- 01622853930
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window