HYPERACTIVE CHILDREN'S SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Aims of the Hyperactive Children's Support Group have been for the last 45 years to provide, Help, Information, Ideas and Advice to Parents, Carers and Professionals who are concerned about Hyperactivity/ ADHD in children and young people. Our main focus is on non-medication approaches to Hyperactivity/ ADHD. HACSG has undertaken research and provides literature and publications..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 May 1979: Standard registration
- 16 May 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 16 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1018643 SUSTAIN: THE ALLIANCE FOR BETTER FOOD & FARMING
- HACSG (Working name)
- HYPER-ACTIVE CHILDREN'S SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.17k | £2.68k | £4.10k | £14.35k | £2.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.08k | £9.90k | £10.43k | £10.43k | £8.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29TH MARCH 1979 AS AMENDED 6TH MARCH 1984, 9 NOVEMBER 1996 AND 11 OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF BEING HANDICAPPED THROUGH HYPERACTIVITY. (B) TO CONDUCT RESEARCH AND PROMOTE INVESTIGATION INTO THE INCIDENCE OF HYPERACTIVITY IN THE UK ITS CAUSES AND TREATMENTS; AND TO DISSEMINATE INFORMATION CONCERNING THIS CONDITION.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window