BUCKINGHAM AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 277645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a youth group that meets weekly to undertake a range of different activities. We attend talks, take part in sports, undertake training, enjoy fun and games, raise money for charity, and compete against other young farmers clubs. The club is open to anyone aged between 10 and 26 years old.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £15,774
Total expenditure: £15,419

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 May 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • YOUNG FARMERS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan James David Brooks Trustee 11 October 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.06k £2.97k £3.18k £6.63k £15.77k
Total expenditure £6.26k £1.49k £2.96k £3.43k £15.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 December 2021 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 May 2021 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Finmere Grounds Farm
Water Stratford Road
Finmere
BUCKINGHAM
MK18 4AT
Phone:
07974740312