PAPWORTH AND ENHAM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation supports the needs of people with disabilities. It also has the power to assist their needy dependants. These objectives are fulfilled in practice by raising appeal funds for its two associated charities, the Papworth Trust and Enham Trust, both of which are concerned with the training, employment and housing of people with disabilities and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 June 1979: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Louise Miller | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Bull | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Credidio | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Betteridge | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jordan William Lister | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £287 | £140.79k | £400 | £265 | £326 | |
|
Total expenditure | £79 | £83 | £30.11k | £110.61k | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH DECEMBER 1951 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ON 7TH MARCH 1979, 3RD SEPTEMBER 1982, AND 14TH OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF IN CASES OF NEED OF PERSONS WHO ARE DISABLED AS A RESULT OF INJURY, ACCIDENT, DISEASE, SICKNESS OR ILLNESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Enham Trust
Enham Alamein
ANDOVER
SP11 6JS
- Phone:
- 01380 735 327
- Email:
- david.betteridge@aster.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window