Dreams 'n' Wishes Productions

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To Provide an outlet for members and children of the local community in Milton Keynes and surrounding areas to practise and learn the activities of the performing arts and to provide an opportunity for members of the public to access and experience the performing arts within their own community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 10 May 1979: Standard registration
- MILTON KEYNES AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN PHILIP DONALD DOWELL | Chair | 19 November 2008 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Alexander Smith | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Stanley Putman | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Amies | Trustee | 14 November 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.59k | £17.09k | £117.96k | £81.12k | £131.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.94k | £11.09k | £144.46k | £77.58k | £160.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £16.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 27 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 May 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 15 May 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 31 August 2022 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH SEPTEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED 12TH SEPTEMBER 2001 AND 11TH SEPTEMBER 2002 as amended on 01 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN TH DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPREACIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS.
Area of benefit
MILTON KEYNES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Buttermilk Hall Farm
Stoke Road
Blisworth
NORTHAMPTON
NN7 3DP
- Phone:
- 01604861985
- Email:
- kevin@dreamsnwishes.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window