ROYAL FREE HOSPITAL KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the charity is the raising of money by donations and fund raising for the purposes of assisting renal patients within The Royal Free Hampstead NHS Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 June 1979: Standard registration
- RFHKPA (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nii Plange | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Peter Victor Czwartos | Trustee | 02 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Funmi Lawal | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
LOUIS TOUSSAINT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL SLANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MYERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CARYL ANNE BRYANT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.72k | £26.36k | £18.17k | £6.99k | £11.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.74k | £26.56k | £34.12k | £18.77k | £7.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 06 July 2021 | 341 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 06 July 2021 | 341 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 FEB 1979
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST PATIENTS ON DIALYSIS AND FOLLOWING TRANSPLANTATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TO BE OPENED BY KPA
Renal Admin Hub
Upper 3rd Floor
Royal Free London NHS Trust
Pond Street
Hampstea
- Phone:
- 07359497044
- Email:
- rfhkpa@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window