Financial history RICHMOND UPON THAMES TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity number: 277713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £2.79k £2.85k £4.36k £2.79k £2.63k
Total expenditure £2.20k £1.29k £1.18k £2.21k £2.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A