RICHMOND UPON THAMES TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE TALKING NEWSPAPER PROVIDES AN AUDIO VERSION OF LOCAL NEWS AND EVENTS TAKEN FROM THE LOCAL NEWSPAPERS AND OTHER SOURCES TO PEOPLE WHO ARE PRINT-DISABLED IN THE BOROUGHS OF RICHMOND-UPON-THAMES AND HOUNSLOW AS A WEEKLY SERVICE. A SPECIAL MAGAZINE EDITION IS SENT OUT AT CHRISTMAS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Hounslow
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 14 June 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Herbert | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Howard Gooder | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Kelly | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barry Donovan | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR ALICK MUNRO | Trustee | 29 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE MUNRO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACKIE VENUS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.79k | £2.85k | £4.36k | £2.79k | £2.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.20k | £1.29k | £1.18k | £2.21k | £2.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/03/1979 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2000 AS AMENDED ON 04/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR PARTIALLY BLIND, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED MATERIAL.
Area of benefit
RICHMOND UPON THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 ERNCROFT WAY
TWICKENHAM
TW1 1DA
- Phone:
- 02088929243
- Email:
- valerie@auntieplanty.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window