Financial history REGIL VILLAGE HALL AND INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 277722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.63k £12.55k £2.15k £5.30k £5.99k
Total expenditure £16.28k £4.20k £2.04k £4.43k £4.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A