REGIL VILLAGE HALL AND INSTITUTE

Charity number: 277722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of Village Hall for Community Activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,988
Total expenditure: £4,697

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 May 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN DEAN Trustee 01 May 2017
None on record
KEITH PLETTS Trustee 01 May 2017
None on record
DENISE CUTLAN Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record
BEN KEEDWELL Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.63k £12.55k £2.15k £5.30k £5.99k
Total expenditure £16.28k £4.20k £2.04k £4.43k £4.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Regil Village Hall
The Street
Regil
Winford
BRISTOL
BS40 8BD
Phone:
01761463169
Website:

No information available