THE PAIN RELIEF FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Seeking to find the causes of human chronic and other pain Seeking to understand the mechanisms of human chronic and other pain Conducting research into human chronic and other pain Providing grants for research into human chronic and other pain Seeking to find improved methods of treating human chronic pain Educating health professionals at all levels into the treatment of human chronic pain
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 March 1979: Standard registration
- 13 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 13 January 2015: Funds transferred to 1156227 PAIN RELIEF FOUNDATION
- PAIN RESEARCH FOUNDATION (Working name)
- PRF (Working name)
- THE PAIN RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF THE PAIN RELIEF FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £372.84k | £357.80k | £318.46k | £318.46k | £457.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £491.35k | £529.57k | £493.38k | £493.38k | £363.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 10 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | 10 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 09 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | 09 October 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 25 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | 07 November 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2011 | 18 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2011 | 21 October 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 MARCH 1979 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 18 APRIL 2001.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF ALL FORMS OF MEDICAL RESEARCH AND IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF OF PAIN AND ALL PAINFUL CONDITIONS OF EVERY TYPE WHATOSVER AND HOWSOVER CAUSED AND O DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window