Accounts and annual returns THE VANDYKE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 277749
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2011 21 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2010 26 November 2011 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required