Financial history THE VANDYKE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 277749
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 30/09/2011
Total gross income £2.00k £2.16k £2.28k £1.40k £546
Total expenditure £1.64k £1.89k £172 £206 £2.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A