THE BANGLADESH WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide advice/information on welfare rights, housing, primary healthcare, education, training, employment, environmental issues, human rights. people with disabilities, help the homeless people, to advance the education of children and to relieve poverty amongst Bangladeshi's in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Luton
Governance
- 14 May 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Farid Ahmed | Chair | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £30 | £10 | £0 | £15 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 September 2023 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND APRIL 1979
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MUSLIM CHILDREN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF ISLAM. 3. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST BANGLADESHIS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN BANGLADESH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 2A, Crystal House
New Bedford Road
Luton
LU1 1HS
- Phone:
- 01582728223
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window