FRIENDS OF LYDNEY HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund Raising for Lydney & District Hospital
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 14 May 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Midgley | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY ROBERT ELLIS WILLIAMS FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VISCOUNT BLEDISLOE | Trustee |
|
||||||
Mary Thurston | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.07k | £57.53k | £150.79k | £75.06k | £84.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.42k | £17.02k | £15.18k | £19.49k | £24.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 05 October 2021 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 24 August 2021 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 25 November 2020 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 25 November 2020 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH APRIL 1979
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF LYDNEY HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK CONVALESCENT DISABLED HANDICAPPED INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRIENDS OF LYDNEY HOSPITAL
Althorpe House
High Street
LYDNEY
Gloucestershire
GL15 5DD
- Phone:
- 01594847400
- Email:
- folh@watts-group.co.uk
- Website:
-
friendsoflydneyhospital.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window