Financial history SOLENT SEA-RESCUE ORGANISATION

Charity number: 277791
Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £74.37k £76.87k £76.97k £78.27k £51.63k
Total expenditure £68.91k £73.86k £71.77k £76.80k £110.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £62.75k £65.86k £65.89k £65.94k N/A