THE FRIENDS OF FULHAM PALACE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To inform local residents and the public generally of the historical importance of Fulham Palace and its botanical gardens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 19 June 1979: Standard registration
- 01 February 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 01 February 2022: Funds transferred to 1140088 FULHAM PALACE TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.62k | £18.93k | £17.80k | £21.16k | £12.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.59k | £14.22k | £15.68k | £18.60k | £9.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 16 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 14 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH APRIL 1979 AS AMENDED ON 17 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FULHAM PALACE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, AND ESPECIALLY THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM AND OTHER NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS, BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THE SITE'S ARCHAEOLOGY, ARCHITECTURE, HISTORY AND HORTICULTURE 2) TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO FULHAM PALACE TRUST (1140088), OR OTHER GOVERNING BODY, FOR THE RESTORATION AND MAINTENANCE OF FULHAM PALACE'S BUILDING, GARDENS AND COLLECTIONS, INCLUDING THE ACQUISITION OF NEW COLLECTION ITEMS AND OTHER POTENTIAL PROJECTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND PRESERVATION OF FULHAM PALACE AND ITS GROUNDS AND BUILDINGS FOR FUTURE GENERATIONS
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window