Financial history THE JUBILEE SAILING TRUST

Charity number: 277810
Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £3.75m £4.07m £3.12m £2.11m £3.09m
Total expenditure £4.98m £4.34m £3.56m £2.32m £3.58m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £93.75k
Income from government grants £269.63k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.73m £2.36m £2.06m £1.21m £2.22m
Income - Other trading activities £38.44k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.93m £1.67m £1.04m £668.23k £869.16k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £25 £112 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £58.23k £39.85k £18.31k £223.68k £0
Income - Legacies £181.57k £162.80k £204.63k £399.15k £255.59k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.49m £3.89m £3.19m £2.07m £3.57m
Expenditure - Raising funds £458.94k £451.40k £372.75k £253.38k £10.48k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £22.64k £0 £0 £0 £0