THE PRINCESS ANNE'S CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support charitable bodies or for other such charitable purposes as the Trustees shall decide and in particular those in which The Princess Royal has an interest. The Trustees do not make grants to individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 May 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julian Arthur Vaughan Smith | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|||||||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVID ROGER MORGAN | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|||||||||
SALLY JENNIFER TENNANT OBE | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
VICE ADMIRAL SIR TIM LAURENCE KCVO CB ADC | Trustee | 14 September 1988 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £235.07k | £359.39k | £229.02k | £260.05k | £242.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £246.52k | £233.72k | £392.65k | £279.62k | £280.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH MARCH 1979
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETON THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUCKINGHAM PALACE
LONDON
SW1A 1AA
- Phone:
- 02070244199
- Email:
- JOHN.BOYD@ROYAL.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window